MN HF1759 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transit and highway project development governing requirements established, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Transit and highway project development governing requirements established, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Her |
2021-03-10 | House | Authors added Gomez and Noor |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF1810 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy