MN HF1729 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Huot and Lee
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Huot and Lee
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School lunch and breakfast for all students provided, and money appropriated.
Title
School lunch and breakfast for all students provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Authors added Huot and Lee |
2022-03-28 | House | Authors added Carlson and Wazlawik |
2022-03-24 | House | Authors added Greenman, Gomez, and Noor |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Pryor |
2022-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Morrison, Feist |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Masin, Becker-Finn, Her, Hornstein, Freiberg, Edelson, and Pinto |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Howard |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Acomb and Long |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |