MN HF1706 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Telehealth requirements modified, medical assistance reimbursement increased for protected transport services, grants established, and money appropriated.
Title
Telehealth requirements modified, medical assistance reimbursement increased for protected transport services, grants established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] |
Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Author added Bahner |
2023-03-13 | House | Authors added Pursell and Moller |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1826 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Referred to Health and Human Services