MN HF168 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Author added Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Author added Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; personal care assistant and support worker hour limitations increased, personal care assistance compensation permitted for services provided by a parent or spouse during a peacetime emergency for an outbreak, temporary rate increases provided for personal care assistance, and money appropriated.
Title
COVID-19; personal care assistant and support worker hour limitations increased, personal care assistance compensation permitted for services provided by a parent or spouse during a peacetime emergency for an outbreak, temporary rate increases provided for personal care assistance, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: H.F. NO. 168 (Y: 71 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Author added Masin |
2020-05-04 | House | Author added Murphy |
2020-05-04 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-04-30 | House | Author added Noor |
2020-04-28 | House | Authors added Lillie, Kunesh-Podein, Bierman, Hassan, Bernardy, and Lippert |
2020-04-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF92 (Similar To) 2020-05-06 - Chief author added Relph