MN HF1677 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human services policy modifications provided; unmarked vehicle use authorized; background study expense requirements, cost of care requirements, and Minnesota Indian Family Preservation Act modified; nonemergency medical transportation service documentation required; council continued; Indian child out-of-home placement provisions modified; conforming changes made; rulemaking authorized; and criminal penalties provided.
Title
Human services policy modifications provided; unmarked vehicle use authorized; background study expense requirements, cost of care requirements, and Minnesota Indian Family Preservation Act modified; nonemergency medical transportation service documentation required; council continued; Indian child out-of-home placement provisions modified; conforming changes made; rulemaking authorized; and criminal penalties provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2015-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1553 (Similar To) 2015-03-18 - Second reading