MN HF1659 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy technician to pharmacist permitted ratio increased, definitions modified, and Pharmacy Board size increased.
Title
Pharmacy technician to pharmacist permitted ratio increased, definitions modified, and Pharmacy Board size increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-03-19 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1765 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance