MN HF1644 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education; hours of instruction definition modified, distance instruction provided, instruction model working group established, and report required.
Title
Education; hours of instruction definition modified, distance instruction provided, instruction model working group established, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Morrison |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1441 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Author added Duckworth