MN HF1625 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Employers prohibited from inquiring about past pay.
Title
Employers prohibited from inquiring about past pay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
2023-02-15 | House | Authors added Liebling, Becker-Finn, Reyer, Jordan, and Pursell |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF1885 (Similar To) 2023-03-15 - Second reading