MN HF1596 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Zeleznikar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Zeleznikar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PACE program funding mechanism established, and money appropriated.
Title
PACE program funding mechanism established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
Rep. Natalie Zeleznikar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2023-03-20 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2023-03-16 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2023-03-15 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2023-03-06 | House | Authors added Reyer (as chief author) and Franson |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1640 (Similar To) 2023-02-13 - Referred to Human Services