MN HF1594 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Kresha
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Author added Kresha
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis; YWCA funding provided for job skills training in early childhood education, and money appropriated.
Title
Minneapolis; YWCA funding provided for job skills training in early childhood education, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Kresha |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Author stricken Haley |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF867 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy