MN HF1586 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Motorcycle safety education program fund allocation provisions modified.
Title
Motorcycle safety education program fund allocation provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Ernie Leidiger [R] |
Rep. Mike LeMieur [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Ron Shimanski [R] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
2012-03-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Policy and Finance |
2012-02-09 | House | Author added Mariani |
2011-04-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |