MN HF1572 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Miller
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Miller
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Choose Life special license plates established, and money appropriated.
Title
Choose Life special license plates established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Miller |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Erickson |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1802 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy