MN HF1568 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Light rail transit operators subjected to the reckless or careless driving law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Light rail transit operators subjected to the reckless or careless driving law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2019-04-03HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1339
2019-03-25HouseSecond reading
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Runbeck
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF1339 (Similar To) 2019-04-12 - Secretary of State, Filed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback