MN HF1543 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Background study set aside criteria modified.
Title
Background study set aside criteria modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-12 | House | Author stricken Zerwas |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2019-03-28 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 1, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1694 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Second reading