MN HF1541 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cedar Lake area water and sanitary sewer district special law certificate filing time period extended.
Title
Cedar Lake area water and sanitary sewer district special law certificate filing time period extended.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Vogel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2015-04-30 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1499 |
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1499 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 19 05/07/15