MN HF1540 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author stricken Koznick
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

University of Minnesota pediatric resident mental health training program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Minnesota pediatric resident mental health training program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseAuthor stricken Koznick
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Koznick
2019-03-08HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-06HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Sandell
2019-02-21HouseReferred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1702 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Author added Draheim

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback