MN HF1540 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author stricken Koznick
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author stricken Koznick
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
University of Minnesota pediatric resident mental health training program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
University of Minnesota pediatric resident mental health training program funding provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Author stricken Koznick |
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Koznick |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-06 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Sandell |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1702 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Author added Draheim