MN SF1702 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Draheim
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health training program for University of Minnesota (U of M) pediatric residents appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health training program for University of Minnesota (U of M) pediatric residents appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateAuthor added Draheim
2019-03-07SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-02-28SenateAuthor added Jensen
2019-02-25SenateReferred to Higher Education Finance and Policy
2019-02-25SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1540 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Author stricken Koznick

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback