MN HF1531 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-27 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
East Grand Forks; Minnesota Department of Agriculture potato inspection facility capital improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
East Grand Forks; Minnesota Department of Agriculture potato inspection facility capital improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-02-20 | House | Authors added Reyer and Hussein |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF1970 (Similar To) 2023-03-30 - Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Finance