MN HF1530 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Airports Commission required to prohibit outsourcing of certain jobs.
Title
Metropolitan Airports Commission required to prohibit outsourcing of certain jobs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections | |
2009-03-18 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2009-03-12 | House: Author added Champion | |
2009-03-11 | House: Referred by Chair to Local Government Division | |
2009-03-09 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF1530&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF1530.0.pdf |