MN HF1518 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Demuth, Boe and Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Authors added Demuth, Boe and Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Absentee voting compensation methods prohibited, identification of individuals acting as absentee voter agent required, identification of individuals assisting a voter in a polling place required, voter registration and absentee voting activities prohibited, and criminal penalties increased.
Title
Absentee voting compensation methods prohibited, identification of individuals acting as absentee voter agent required, identification of individuals assisting a voter in a polling place required, voter registration and absentee voting activities prohibited, and criminal penalties increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] | Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Authors added Demuth, Boe and Bliss |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-01-31 | House | Authors added Rasmusson, O'Driscoll, and Heintzeman |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |