MN HF1494 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dyslexia instruction required for all teaching license tiers preparation programs, and report required.
Title
Dyslexia instruction required for all teaching license tiers preparation programs, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Fischer and Lillie |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Acomb |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Moller and Christensen |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |