MN HF1470 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-01 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-01 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public authority allowed to discontinue child support services.
Title
Public authority allowed to discontinue child support services.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 72 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Scott motion - Re-referred (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Scott motion - Re-referred (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 72-56 |
2013-04-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2013-04-29 | House | Amended |
2013-04-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 29, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 59-68 |
2013-03-20 | House | Motion to re-refer Health and Human Services Policy |
2013-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |