MN HF1451 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Author added Pfarr
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Property tax provisions modified, and disabled veterans market value exclusion modified by increasing exclusion amount for totally and permanently disabled veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax provisions modified, and disabled veterans market value exclusion modified by increasing exclusion amount for totally and permanently disabled veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HouseAuthor added Pfarr
2023-02-09HouseAuthor added Tabke
2023-02-08HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF1253 (Similar To) 2024-05-07 - Author stricken Draheim

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback