MN HF1430 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Author added Ecklund (chief).
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Author added Ecklund (chief).
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ely; International Wolf Center funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Ely; International Wolf Center funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. David Dill [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Author added Ecklund (chief). |
2015-03-10 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2015-03-05 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1341 (Similar To) 2015-03-04 - Referred to Capital Investment