MN HF1426 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Carpet stewardship program established.
Title
Carpet stewardship program established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-04-08 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1171 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance