MN HF1415 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Bill was not passed vote: 48-74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Bill was not passed vote: 48-74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fantasy sports authorized and regulated, and money appropriated.
Title
Fantasy sports authorized and regulated, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 48 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Bill was not passed vote: 48-74 |
2018-04-24 | House | Third reading |
2018-04-19 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1402 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Withdrawn and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections