MN HF1409 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher candidates of color financial aid provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Teacher candidates of color financial aid provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Poston. |
2017-03-08 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2017-03-06 | House | Authors added Johnson, C., and Davnie. |
2017-03-02 | House | Authors added Slocum and Hamilton. |
2017-03-01 | House | Authors added Maye Quade and Kunesh-Podein. |
2017-02-27 | House | Authors added Lee and Mariani. |
2017-02-23 | House | Authors added Lien; Omar; Murphy, E.; and Moran. |
2017-02-22 | House | Authors added Thissen and Jessup. |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1585 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy