MN HF1407 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added West.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added West.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Women-run cooperative child care businesses in low-income urban areas pilot program funding provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Women-run cooperative child care businesses in low-income urban areas pilot program funding provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Author added West. |
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2080 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy