MN HF1386 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Unfair business practices prevented by credit and debit card companies.
Title
Unfair business practices prevented by credit and debit card companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Bills [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Kirk Stensrud [R] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Tom Tillberry [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Steve Gottwalt [R] | Rep. Katherine Knuth [D] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2011-05-02 | House | Author added Knuth |
2011-04-26 | House | Author added Gottwalt |
2011-04-18 | House | Author added Atkins |
2011-04-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1386&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF1386&version=0&session=ls87 |