MN HF1382 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Backer.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Author added Backer.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regional public library systems state aid formula modified; funding increased for regional public library systems and multicounty, multitype libraries; and money appropriated.
Title
Regional public library systems state aid formula modified; funding increased for regional public library systems and multicounty, multitype libraries; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Backer. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Sandstede and Johnson, C. |
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Mariani. |
2017-03-06 | House | Author added Liebling. |
2017-02-23 | House | Author added Davids. |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Poston. |
2017-02-20 | House | Authors added Theis and Bennett. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1033 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Author added Tomassoni