MN HF1323 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Debt limit established.
Title
Debt limit established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-02-20 | House | Author added Daniels. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF1112 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Author added Eichorn