MN HF1300 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Month of May designated as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.
Title
Month of May designated as Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-07 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 07, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1612 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections