MN HF1284 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Soil and water conservation district funding provided.
Title
Soil and water conservation district funding provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-04-11 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Authors added Bierman and Huot |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Sandstede and Poston |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1443 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Taxes