MN HF1276 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Author added Flanagan.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Author added Flanagan.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's product chemicals of high concern regulated.
Title
Children's product chemicals of high concern regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2016-03-10 | House | Author added Hilstrom as chief author. |
2015-03-10 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2015-03-04 | House | Author added Erhardt. |
2015-03-02 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Bly. |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1099 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance