MN HF1217 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-25 - Author added Murphy, M.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-25 - Author added Murphy, M.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent enrollment provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Concurrent enrollment provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Yvonne Selcer [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Anna Wills [R] | Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-25 | House | Author added Murphy, M. |
2015-04-09 | House | Author added Wills. |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2015-03-12 | House | Author added Newton. |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Higher Education Policy and Finance |
2015-03-02 | House | Author added Mariani. |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF995 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance