MN HF1199 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Driving privilege reinstatement with ignition interlock provided, manufacturers of ignition interlock device required to pay for operating malfunctions, and money appropriated.
Title
Driving privilege reinstatement with ignition interlock provided, manufacturers of ignition interlock device required to pay for operating malfunctions, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-03-10 | House | Authors added Frazier and Moller |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Huot, Edelson and Poston |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1101 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Author added Bigham