MN HF1196 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Competitive bid advertisement publications in a recognized industry trade journal authorized.
Title
Competitive bid advertisement publications in a recognized industry trade journal authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2013-04-16 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF843 |
2013-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |