MN HF1182 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Halverson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Halverson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Immunization-related activities funded for geographic areas and populations experiencing or at risk of experiencing an outbreak of a vaccine-preventable disease grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Immunization-related activities funded for geographic areas and populations experiencing or at risk of experiencing an outbreak of a vaccine-preventable disease grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Halverson |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Bernardy, Her, and Huot |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1629 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Author added Jensen