MN HF117 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Author added Fabian.
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Author added Fabian.
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sanctuary cities aid reduced.
Title
Sanctuary cities aid reduced.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Fabian. |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF80 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Referred to Taxes