MN HF1166 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Authors added Boldon and Jordan
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Authors added Boldon and Jordan
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water safety grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Water safety grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Cedrick Frazier [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] |
Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Boldon and Jordan |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Baker, Lee, Theis, Jurgens, Lippert, Frazier and Acomb |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1693 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Author added Cwodzinski