MN HF1152 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clean Slate Act established, and automatic expungement process provided for offenders.
Title
Clean Slate Act established, and automatic expungement process provided for offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Gomez |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Feist and Edelson |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Frazier |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Hausman |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Hertaus |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Garofalo, Pinto and Vang |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1856 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Author added Bigham