MN HF1151 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sanstede
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sanstede
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Finance Agency funding provided for housing programs, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing Finance Agency funding provided for housing programs, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Sanstede |
2019-04-03 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1577 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy