MN HF1151 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sanstede
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Housing Finance Agency funding provided for housing programs, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Finance Agency funding provided for housing programs, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Sanstede
2019-04-03HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Mariani
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Lillie
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1577 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback