MN HF1146 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mileage-based user fee pilot program provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Mileage-based user fee pilot program provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Brad Tabke [D] |
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-03 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-04-01 | House | Recalled by Chair Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-12 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1122 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy