MN HF108 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - By Motion, Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - By Motion, Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; grant and appropriation extensions provided, and report required.
Title
COVID-19; grant and appropriation extensions provided, and report required.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Senate | By Motion, Laid on Table |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-06-19 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-06-19 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-06-19 | House | Amended |
2020-06-18 | House | Second reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-06-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-06-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance Division |