MN HF1070 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Author added Vogel.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Author added Vogel.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax payer assistance grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Tax payer assistance grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Vogel. |
2017-02-15 | House | Authors added Wills and Applebaum. |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF816 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Chief author added Koran