MN SF816 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chief author added Koran
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chief author added Koran
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxpayer assistance grants appropriation
Title
Taxpayer assistance grants appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Chief author added Koran |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Senjem |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1070 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Author added Vogel.