MN HF1036 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's mental health therapists hiring and training for Washburn Center for Children pathways program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Children's mental health therapists hiring and training for Washburn Center for Children pathways program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Morrison |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1558 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy