MN HF1022 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Author added Feist
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Author added Feist
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Working tax credit eligibility expanded.
Title
Working tax credit eligibility expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Youakim |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2123 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Taxes